Trustees NEW BEGINNINGS 4U CIO
Charity number: 1181107

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Hilder | Chair | 26 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Harper | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonah Harper | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susannah Weeks | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sara Hughes | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Dawn Howarth | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CONOLLY | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Gale-Sides | Trustee | 26 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER GEORGE FRANKLIN | Trustee | 26 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Hilder | Trustee | 26 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.