THE CUTLERS' HALL PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve and maintain for the benefit of the towns people of Sheffield the historical, architectural and constructional heritage of the Cutlers Hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 07 September 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER JOHN JEWITT DL | Chair | 09 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Philip Paul Rodrigo | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Ian Robert Nicholls | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Keith Jackson | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Charles James Turner DL | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Henry Newman | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.87k | £117.39k | £213.21k | £163.49k | £150.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £226.44k | £231.57k | £213.40k | £246.28k | £331.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 JULY 1982
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE TOWNSPEOPLE OF SHEFFIELD IN THE COUNTY OF YORK AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE, WHATEVER OF THE ENGLISH HISTORICAL, ARCITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THE CUTLERS' HALL AFORESAID IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD IN THE COUNTY OF YORK AND THE NATION AT LARGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE COMPANY OF CUTLERS IN
HALLAMSHIRE
CUTLERS HALL
7-15 CHURCH STREET
SHEFFIELD
S11HG
- Phone:
- 01142728456
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window