DUP WELFARE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
collection of donation for students who study at Darul uloom Pretoria or those who will go from the Uk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- South Africa
Governance
- 27 June 2019: Standard registration
- DARUL ULOOM PRETORIA WELFARE UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faisal Javed Akhtar | Chair | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Hassnain Raza | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
TAUSEEF AHMED KHAN | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Abdul Razzaq | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.43k | £23.86k | £14.33k | £10.01k | £6.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.15k | £7.88k | £6.10k | £15.82k | £11.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 JAN 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (ÆTHE OBJECTSÆ) ARE: 1. TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM ACCORDING TO THE QURAN THE SUNNAH AND HADITH BY MEANS OF, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A MOSQUE AND MADRASSAH IN BIRMINGHAM. 2. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 EASTBOURNE AVENUE
BIRMINGHAM
B34 6AP
- Phone:
- 07939375163
- Email:
- faisal.javed325@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window