PEC TRUST

Charity Number: 1183711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PEC Trust provides expertise, educational resources and support services to empower people to heat and power their homes affordably, at the same time increasing community confidence to engage in energy issues and to reduce greenhouse gases. These activities will benefit the fuel poor and those most vulnerable. The activities involve one to one and groups and active engagement with stakeholders.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall
  • Devon
  • Plymouth City
  • Torbay

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 June 2019: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Hutchcroft Chair 19 July 2019
None on record
Tom Briars-Delve Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
Mohammed Chaanda Trustee 10 February 2022
None on record
John Bailey Trustee 10 February 2022
None on record
Zoe Sydenham Trustee 10 February 2022
None on record
William Burnyeat Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Tracy Ebbrell Trustee 11 November 2020
None on record
Paul Hardman Trustee 04 December 2019
None on record
Jessica Holliland Trustee 04 December 2019
None on record
Kieran VanBussel Trustee 04 December 2019
None on record
Owen Ryles Trustee 03 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £602.09k £1.26m £2.08m £1.91m £2.42m
Total expenditure £353.54k £1.09m £1.52m £1.79m £2.30m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £200.91k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £287.11k £1.08m £1.88m £906.34k £1.44m
Income - Donations and legacies £179.51k £12.70k £63.38k £58.62k £136.08k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £422.59k £1.25m £2.02m £1.85m £2.27m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £755 £8.75k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £353.22k £1.09m £1.52m £1.79m £2.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £313 £385 £0 £1.16k £1.19k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £5.85k £0 £142.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £17.57k £147.25k £29.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £0 £0 £7.89k £10.88k £14.29k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £1 £0
Other assets £284.29k £506.91k £1.14m £1.21m £1.69m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £33.67k £83.50k £159.41k £115.54k £488.56k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 15 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 15 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 20 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 20 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 11 May 2023 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 11 May 2023 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 16 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 16 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Plymouth City Council
C/O LOW CARBON TEAM
Ballard House
26 West Hoe Road
PLYMOUTH
Phone:
01752304255