SANDHURST YOUTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To act as a resource for young people between the ages of 11 and 21 in Sandhurst and the surrounding area by providing advice and assistance and organising programmes of physical, educational and other activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £17,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
Governance
- 13 December 2018: CIO registration
- 16 April 2024: Funds received from 1058643 THE DOCTOR HOWARD STILLIARD MEMORIAL FUND
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven John Kaufman | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Newman | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|||||
KAREN DAWN SYMONS FCA | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ROBIN PERCIVAL | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Jean Margaret Bettison | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.80k | £21.46k | £52.95k | £37.07k | £39.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.37k | £29.89k | £34.57k | £36.41k | £43.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.00k | £17.00k | £17.00k | £17.00k | £17.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 11 AND 21 IN SANDHURST AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 11 AND 21 IN SANDHURST AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
SANDHURST AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Michaels Pastoral Centre
Lower Church Road
Sandhurst
GU47 8HN
- Phone:
- 01344779658
- Email:
- info@sandhurstyouth.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window