786 WOLVERHAMPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ENHANCE THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES LIVING IN WOLVERHAMPTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £4,898 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 20 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR JAMES PARKES | Chair | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHAKEELA ASIF | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||
MATLUB BEGUM | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
KHALID MAHMUD KHAN | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
SALMA IBRAHIM | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.01k | £12.63k | £22.17k | £19.77k | £21.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.92k | £11.45k | £19.04k | £21.09k | £16.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £150 | £10.84k | £12.21k | £15.12k | £4.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ENHANCE THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 4 TO 18 YEARS OF AGE LIVING IN WOLVERHAMPTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF ITEMS AND HOLIDAY SCHEMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
T L C COLLEGE
DUNSTALL HEIGHTS
1 DUNSTALL ROAD
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV6 0LZ
- Phone:
- 07737236417
- Email:
- is786wolves@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window