ANKER RADIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Anker Radio is a Volunteer run Hospital Broadcasting Radio Station based within the George Eliot Hospital in Nuneaton, Warwickshire. We provide a talk/music/Hospital information based Service to the Patients & Nursing Staff on Site seven days a week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 20 November 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN GOODMAN | Chair | 24 November 2018 |
|
|||||
David Ian Jennings | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Randall Veasey | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
BARRY WILLIAM HAYWARD | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £5.10k | £7.02k | £5.02k | £5.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £713 | £5.00k | £5.48k | £6.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Nov 2018 as amended on 15 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, POOR HEALTH AND OLD AGE AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA SERVED BY THE GEORGE ELIOT HOSPITAL NHS TRUST OR ITS SUCCESSORS BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR HOSPITALS, RESIDENTIAL HOMES AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS, AND FOR PATIENTS RECEIVING COMMUNITY CARE; AND (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE BENEFITS OF LIVING A HEALTHY LIFESTYLE, AND THE IMPORTANCE OF MAINTAINING GOOD PERSONAL MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH BY (MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) THE MEANS OF BROADCASTING HEALTH EDUCATION MESSAGES TO PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA SERVED BY THE GEORGE ELIOT HOSPITAL NHS TRUST OR ITS SUCCESSORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ANKER RADIO
C/O The Saunders Club
Saunders Avenue
Bedworth
Warwicks
- Phone:
- 024 7501 0806
- Email:
- studio@ankerradio.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window