PHOENIX CREATIVE ARTS


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
-
Notice of dissolution on application of the CIO (see details)
The Commission intends to dissolve this CIO after three months from the date of this notice unless cause is shown to the contrary. Representations must be made to the Commission within three months. Email your representation to CIOnotices@charitycommission.gov.uk
Quote the charity number and head the email 'CIO dissolution representation'.
Notice dated: 20 February 2025
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities will include promoting and organizing Concerts and other "Creative Arts" events in order to raise funds for our objectives. We will reach out to under-privileged; allowing them to use their skills and advance it in all forms of "Creative Arts". We will also use it as a form of therapy in hospitals and Care Homes. In the future we also hope to offer grants and scholarships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 May 2019: CIO registration
- ARTS NO BORDERS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Reza Beyad | Chair | 28 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Rutej Ravindra Mehta | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
David William Stephenson | Trustee | 28 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.70k | £0 | £0 | £1.38k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.98k | £720 | £660 | £900 | £814 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 March 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 17 March 2021 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE APPRECIATION IN THE ARTS SUCH AS CREATIVE ARTS IN ALL ITS ASPECTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: -PROVIDING PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE TO THE DELIVERY OF COMMUNITY ARTS ACTIVITY -PROVISION OF AFFORDABLE ACCESS TO THE ARTS -THE FUNDING OF COLLABORATIVE AND CREATIVE ARTS PROJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Lowther Road
LONDON
SW13 9NT
- Phone:
- 020 8237 1423
- Email:
- reza@beyad.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window