GLOBAL ACTION ON MEN'S HEALTH (GAMH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GAMH encourages international and national health organisations to develop research, policies and strategies to tackle men's health problems and we provide guidance on how to take effective action.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Canada
- Ireland
- Malawi
- United States
Governance
- 15 May 2019: CIO registration
- GAMH (Working name)
- GLOBAL ACTION ON MEN'S HEALTH (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek MacGregor Griffith | Chair | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cara E Clements | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shaun Paul Davis | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kenton Boston | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Mary Isabella Montgomery | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rae Bonney | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Kenneth Henry | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Doris Bardehle | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amon Lukhele | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.86k | £37.44k | £23.18k | £147.80k | £71.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.50k | £16.35k | £41.47k | £44.08k | £85.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE HEALTH OF MEN AND BOYS INTERNATIONALLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, INCLUDING BY: A) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING NEEDS OF MEN AND BOYS WITH THE GENERAL PUBLIC, HEALTH PRACTITIONERS AND POLICY MAKERS AND IN SCHOOLS AND WORKPLACES; B) ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING MEN AND BOYS TO TAKE BETTER CARE OF THEIR OWN HEALTH AND THAT OF THEIR PARTNERS AND CHILDREN; C) CARRYING OUT MULTI-DISCIPLINARY RESEARCH INTO THE HEALTH OF MEN AND BOYS PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH; D) MAINTAINING AN APPROACH TO HEALTH THAT FULLY RECOGNISES THE NEEDS OF BOTH SEXES IN POLICY, PRACTICE AND FUNDING AND WHICH PROMOTES GREATER GENDER EQUALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
128 City Road
London
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 07786454905
- Email:
- office@gamh.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window