Accounts and annual returns WORLD SAILING TRUST

Charity number: 1182203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 09 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 March 2024 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 March 2024 147 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required