WORLD SAILING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust works with far-reaching partnerships across the globe, promoting our sport and protecting the waters it depends on so that sailing can be enjoyed by generations to come.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Australia
- Greece
- South Africa
- Spain
Governance
- 25 February 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raksha Patel | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lindani Spes Mchunu | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Graham | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £171.90k | £11.78k | £118.83k | £98.40k | £80.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £208.77k | £6.89k | £76.43k | £79.51k | £80.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 March 2024 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 March 2024 | 147 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 DEC 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 FEB 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (OBJECTS) ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE PARTICIPATION IN SAILING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 3.1.1 PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE TO PARTICIPATE IN SAILING AND DEVELOP RELEVANT SKILLS; 3.1.2 PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO GROW INCLUSIVE, SUSTAINABLE, SAILING
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 401
4th Floor
3 Shortlands
LONDON
- Phone:
- 07836327362
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window