THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARTIN, ST WILFRID AND ST ALBAN, BRIGHTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Place of Public Worship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 04 January 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bradley Richard Cox | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL JAMES WHITTINGTON | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA ROSEMARY BURCHELL | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
HILARY STELLA MARTIN | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANICE SANDRA HOLLINGDALE | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RITA VALERIE CHARLES | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR RONALD HOLLINGDALE | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN ANN POWELL | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN DAVID CHARLES LAWRENCE | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS CLARE PHELAN | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|||||
CLAIR LOUISE WELLARD | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Angela Violet Way | Trustee | 13 March 2016 |
|
|||||
The Revd Canon Trevor George Buxton | Trustee | 11 November 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.02k | £193.16k | £303.98k | £124.74k | £125.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.80k | £106.79k | £134.42k | £117.73k | £119.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARTINS CHURCH
LEWES ROAD
BRIGHTON
BN2 3HQ
- Phone:
- 01273689989
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window