MERCY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mercy Charity is a non-profit Foundation Charitable Incorporated Organisation based in South West Greater London. Surrey County, United Kingdom with an assignment to reach out to the Children and Elderly in need within Great Britain and to raise awareness on how to reach the needy in Developing Nations. Mercy Charity and its dedicated trustees are committed to making provision to its beneficiaries
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OMOTADE ANTHONY FADAIRO | Chair | 30 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sika Olufunmilayo Fadairo | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
WILLY HAUPTMANNL JUNIOR | Trustee | 30 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALBERT GBOLAHAN FADAIRO | Trustee | 30 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
NONSIKELELO KIMBERLY MOYO | Trustee | 30 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
OLUWATOMI ANNA FADAIRO | Trustee | 30 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/12/2020 | 01/12/2021 | 01/12/2022 | 01/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.55k | £2.10k | £1.36k | £508 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.88k | £2.53k | £1.43k | £731 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 December 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 December 2021 | 20 November 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2021 | 20 November 2022 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 December 2020 | 20 November 2022 | 415 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2020 | 20 November 2022 | 415 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OF CHILDREN AND THE ELDERLY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING GRANTS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY
Contact information
- Address:
-
MERCY CHARITY
44
Acre Lane
Carshalton
Surrey
- Phone:
- 02086478590
- Email:
- info@mercycharity.co.uk
- Website:
-
MERCYCHARITY.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window