COMUNIDADE RENASCER EM CRISTO INTERNACIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOLDING REGULAR CHRISTIAN WORSHIP SERVICES TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Brazil
Governance
- 27 November 2018: CIO registration
- COMUNIDADE RENASCER EM CRISTO INTERNACIONAL (Previous name)
- IGREJA EVANGELICA DINAMUS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Goncalo Cardoso de Oliveira Neto | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
DRAGAN IVKOVIC | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELEIDES MARIA RODRIGUES | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.07k | £6.32k | £905 | £23.22k | £14.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.64k | £7.00k | £1.69k | £15.30k | £18.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 21 June 2023 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 21 June 2023 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 29 August 2022 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 14 April 2023 | 379 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Nov 2018 as amended on 05 Jul 2023 as amended on 11 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Rosebery Gardens
LONDON
N8 8SH
- Phone:
- 07984448415
- Email:
- eleides.rodrigues@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window