TIME TO BE OUT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TIME TO BE OUT SUPPORTS PEOPLE WHO ARE REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS WHO IDENTIFY AS LGBT. IT RELIEVES THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE AND ASSISTS THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: - PROVIDING WORKSHOPS, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT - INCREASING AND CO-ORDINATING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEM TO ENGAGE WITH LOCAL COMMUNITIES - RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS ABOUT THEIR SITUATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 June 2019: CIO registration
- TIMEOUT YORK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William John Roche | Chair | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Robinson | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Diego Garcia Rodriguez | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Issam Ghariba | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Mary Parnham | Trustee | 29 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Sylph | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Malcolm Wren | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/06/2020 | 12/06/2021 | 12/06/2022 | 12/06/2023 | 12/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.38k | £19.95k | £15.63k | £24.57k | £22.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.49k | £20.02k | £15.81k | £18.52k | £28.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 June 2024 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 June 2024 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 June 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 June 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 June 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 June 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 June 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 June 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 June 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 June 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
(1)TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE WHO ARE REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS WHO IDENTIFY AS LGBT+ FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE AND TO ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: - PROVIDING WORKSHOPS, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT - INCREASING AND CO-ORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE ABOVE COMMUNITIES TO ENGAGE WITH LOCAL COMMUNITIES - RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS WHO IDENTIFY AS LGBT+, BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Farndale Street
YORK
YO10 4BR
- Phone:
- 01904636882
- Email:
- infotimetobeout@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window