Accounts and annual returns HAWORTH VILLAGE HALL LTD

Charity number: 1182961
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 February 2025 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 11 February 2025 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 May 2024 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 12 May 2024 102 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 May 2024 467 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 May 2024 467 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 March 2022 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 March 2022 39 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 June 2021 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 June 2021 123 days late Download Open in new window