NUMBER 11

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Number 11 is a lifeline for individuals in our community struggling with a variety of issues, from difficulties with debt and benefits through to isolation, unemployment, bereavement or mental illness. Our focus is on a person centred sustainable approach. Number 11 is a family, so in addition to our workshops or one-to-one support we emphasise eating, playing, laughing and doing life together.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 25 July 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sam Taylor | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Clowes | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Hill | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Hibberts | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ree Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Blood | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.37k | £183.09k | £322.38k | £294.55k | £165.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.94k | £123.03k | £190.97k | £294.00k | £240.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £105.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £107.41k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Jul 2019 as amended on 06 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF THOSE IN STOKE-IN-TRENT AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT SERVICES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO ACCESSING BENEFITS AND ACCOMMODATION, DEVELOPING CORE SKILLS, DEBT MANAGEMENT AND EMPLOYABILITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Number 11
11 Chapel Lane
Stoke-on-Trent
ST6 2AB
- Phone:
- 01782961800
- Email:
- info@number11.org.uk
- Website:
-
number11.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window