OURBRAINBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OurBrainBank is an an innovative, patient-led movement designed to move glioblastoma (GBM) from terminal to treatable, powered by patients. It's the first non-profit created by, for, and with people with GBM, a rare and deadly brain cancer whose 5-year survival rate is 5%. Our Founder and Chair, Jessica Morris, a British national living in the US, was disgnosed with GBM in January 2016.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 July 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jake Arnold-Forster | Chair | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Thorne | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Uzmah Yunis | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Esther Suzanne Bathers | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Bennett-Clemmow | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Pilkington | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Nuttall | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Coulson | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Clemmow | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon David Matthews | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.35k | £33.04k | £18.57k | £84.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.63k | £2.80k | £20.06k | £26.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PERSONS LIVING WITH GLIOBLASTOMA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: • THE DEVELOPMENT, PROVISION AND MANAGEMENT OF A MOBILE APPLICATION DESIGNED TO HELP PATIENTS MANAGE THEIR DISEASE AND COLLECT ANONYMISED DATA FOR RESEARCH • THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND INFORMATION TO PERSONS LIVING WITH GLIOBLASTOMA • CONTRIBUTING TO RESEARCH INTO THE NATURE, CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF GLIOBLASTOMA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Florida Street
LONDON
E2 6AL
- Phone:
- 07885 651841
- Email:
- ukinfo@ourbrainbank.org
- Website:
-
ourbrainbank.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window