MALTON, NORTON AND DISTRICT LIONS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of welfare activities to the elderly, undertaking of activities supporting young people and other organisations who undertake activities in line with Lions grant making policies
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 November 2018: CIO registration
- 28 July 2019: Funds received from 260406 MALTON NORTON AND DISTRICT LIONS CLUB CHARITABLE F...
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Paul Lowry | Chair | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Ian Simpson | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Elizabeth Lowry | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabetrh Harrison | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
IAN CRAWFORD DEWHURST | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Russell Philip Grimshaw | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.05k | £40.99k | £34.20k | £33.72k | £34.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.45k | £30.71k | £35.59k | £44.14k | £31.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.00k | £2.27k | £2.38k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 07 NOV 2018 AMENDED ON 22 APR 2021
Charitable objects
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CLUB ARE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ENGLAND & WALES, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR: 1.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP BY: 1.1.1.1 PROMOTING THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP; 1.1.1.2 ENCOURAGING MEMBERS TO TAKE AN ACTIVE INTEREST IN THE CIVIC, CULTURAL, SOCIAL AND MORAL WELFARE OF THE COMMUNITY; 1.1.1.3 PROVIDING A FORUM FOR THE OPEN DISCUSSION OF ALL MATTERS OF PUBLIC INTEREST; PROVIDED THAT PARTISAN POLITICS AND SECTARIAN RELIGION SHALL NOT BE DEBATED BY MEMBERS; 1.1.1.4 ENCOURAGING SERVICE-MINDED PEOPLE TO SERVE THEIR COMMUNITY WITHOUT PERSONAL REWARD AND ENCOURAGING THE PROMOTION OF HIGH ETHICAL STANDARDS IN COMMERCE, INDUSTRY, PROFESSIONS, PUBLIC WORKS AND PRIVATE ENDEAVOURS; 1.1.1.5 SUPPORTING YOUTH TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; 1.1.2 PROMOTING THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PEOPLE IN LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES; 1.1.3 PROMOTING VOLUNTEERING; 1.1.4 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING HUMANITARIAN AID AND DISASTER RELIEF; 1.1.5 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES BY PREVENTING AVOIDABLE BLINDNESS, ASSISTING DISABLED PEOPLE TO LEAD INDEPENDENT LIVES OR HELPING TO PREVENT OR MANAGE HEALTH ISSUES; 1.1.6 PROMOTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; AND/OR 1.1.7 PROMOTING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Duncombe Close
MALTON
YO17 7YY
- Phone:
- 07963121006
- Email:
- russgrimshaw@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window