THE BRIGHTON AND HOVE INDEPENDENT MEDIATION SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Brighton and Hove Independent Mediation Service provides mediation and other conflict resolution services to persons, organisations and groups in and around the City of Brighton and Hove. We also deliver training and educational services that focus on mediation and conflict resolution practices.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £74,536 from 3 government contract(s) and £34,326 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
Governance
- 06 February 2019: CIO registration
- 31 January 2020: Funds received from 1036021 THE BRIGHTON AND HOVE INDEPENDENT MEDIATION SERVIC...
- BHIMS (Working name)
- BRIGHTON AND HOVE INDEPENDENT MEDIATION SERVICE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Smith | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Alexander Abaza | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Hill | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Littman | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN REGI | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.27k | £95.58k | £108.60k | £123.48k | £153.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.70k | £97.97k | £98.24k | £110.47k | £132.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £34.80k | £35.00k | £49.43k | £74.80k | £74.54k | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.00k | £18.00k | £20.00k | £15.51k | £34.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE, PROMOTE AND FACILITATE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE CITY OF BRIGHTON AND HOVE: A) MEDIATION AND OTHER FORMS OF CONFLICT RESOLUTION OR CONCILIATION FOR PERSONS, ORGANISATIONS OR GROUPS INVOLVED, OR LIKELY TO BE COME INVOLVED, IN DISPUTE OR INTER-PERSONAL CONFLICT; B) EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN METHODS OF MEDIATION AND CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND THE NATURE AND CAUSES OF DISPUTES AND THE MEANS TO MANAGE THEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 Ecclesden
Grove Hill
BRIGHTON
BN2 9NG
- Phone:
- 01273700812
- Email:
- mediation@bhims.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window