GLOUCESTERSHIRE COUNTY HISTORY TRUST CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAISING FUNDS TO SUPPORT THE CONTINUED RESEARCHING AND WRITING OF THE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY FOR THE HISTORIC COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE (IE INCLUDING SOUTH GLOS)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bristol City
- Gloucestershire
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 29 January 2019: CIO registration
- 29 May 2024: Funds received from 1138520 GLOUCESTERSHIRE COUNTY HISTORY TRUST
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas William Kingsley | Chair | 17 January 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Thomas Mark Hamilton Shearer | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Richard Randolph Mullings | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Grace Owen | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Susan Barbara Parsons | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Sally Patricia Self | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Susan Elizabeth BROWN | Trustee | 21 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr Rose WALLIS | Trustee | 21 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr JANET ROSEMARY BROADWAY | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
SIR Charles Nicholas Mander Bt FSA MA | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
DAVID HAROLD ALDRED BSC MA | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
HEATHER MARGARET FORBES MArAd FARA | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.56k | £46.08k | £58.42k | £70.88k | £31.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.03k | £26.19k | £37.08k | £34.20k | £42.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF THE HISTORIC COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE (INCLUDING SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE) AND OF THE CITY OF BRISTOL, AND TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE HISTORY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND BRISTOL BY: (A) ADVANCING RESEARCH AND OTHER WORK IN CONNECTION WITH THE PREPARATION OF THE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY OF ENGLAND RELATING TO THE HISTORIC COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND THE CITY OF BRISTOL; AND (B) ENCOURAGING, PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING LOCAL HISTORY RESEARCH AND WRITING IN OR ABOUT THE HISTORIC COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND THE CITY OF BRISTOL, DRAWING ESPECIALLY ON THE USE OF HISTORICAL RESOURCES AND FURTHERING THE ACTIVE PARTICIPATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH EDUCATION AND LEARNING AND PROVIDING THE MEANS OF COMMUNICATION BETWEEN THOSE INVOLVED WITH LOCAL HISTORY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Area of benefit
THE HISTORIC COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE (INCLUDING SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE) AND OF THE CITY OF BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
GLOUCESTERSHIRE ARCHIVES
COUNTY RECORD OFFICE
CLARENCE ROW
ALVIN STREET
GLOUCESTER
GL1 3DW
- Phone:
- 01275542263
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window