COOPER ASSOCIATES FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Cooper Associates Foundation is the philanthropic arm of the Cooper Associates Group, acting to support charities through clients and partners associated with the Cooper Associates community. Our giving is guided by themes, with the main focus on children and young people who have special needs through illness or disability, or who are disadvantaged in other ways.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
- Dorset
- Gloucestershire
- Somerset
Governance
- 17 December 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAMANTHA DAWN JACKSON | Chair | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Alan Regan | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen June Grendon | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN JOHN PARSONS | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS ABELL | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.05k | £16.84k | £15.75k | £38.97k | £27.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.66k | £5.95k | £29.64k | £42.14k | £22.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 26 April 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 26 April 2024 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 APR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2. TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME
Contact information
- Address:
-
COOPER ASSOCIATES
40 ST JAMES STREET
TAUNTON
TA1 1JR
- Phone:
- 01823273880
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window