OIKOS- BRIGG

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian religion in North LIncs through meetings, lectures and producing and distributing literature. Also work amongst young people and those in financial hardship or social need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £331 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 25 July 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malcolm Richard Bailey MA CEng | Chair | 07 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Beverly Anne Barker Lawrance | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Smith | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Piero Strina | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Simpson | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Joan Knaggs | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Cyril Edward Pettit | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.43k | £3.35k | £26.62k | £28.46k | £51.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £959 | £1.83k | £11.48k | £11.46k | £52.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | £331 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OIKOS-BRIGG
67 Wrawby Street
BRIGG
DN20 8JE
- Phone:
- 07946 109069
- Email:
- malcolm@link2energy.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window