Accounts and annual returns BRISTOL & SOMERSET RAYNET GROUP

Charity Number: 1182470
Charity reporting is up to date (75 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 21 April 2025 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 21 April 2025 75 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 02 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 02 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 12 February 2023 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 12 February 2023 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 06 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 06 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 25 March 2021 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 25 March 2021 48 days late Download Open in new window