FRIENDS OF DAVENPORT HOUSE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate in Harpenden, Hertfordshire and the surrounding area by making grants to organisations and by organizing seminars on different medical topics
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 18 December 2018: Standard registration
- 11 January 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DAVENPORT HOUSE PATIENT PARTICIPATION GROUP (PPG) (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 OCT 2018 AS AMENDED ON 17 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS OF THE DAVENPORT HOUSE SURGERY AND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE RESIDING OR WORKING IN THE GENERAL AREA OF HARPENDEN, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES, EQUIPMENT, TRAINING AND EDUCATION, NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE DOCTORS OR THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window