YORKSHIRE COAST HOSPITAL RADIO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Twenty four hour broadcasting on hospital radio.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 22 September 1982: Standard registration
- 09 October 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- B H B S (Working name)
- BRIDLINGTON HOSPITAL BROADCASTING SERVICE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2010 | 30/04/2011 | 30/04/2012 | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.74k | £17.09k | £1.36k | £185 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.98k | £20.04k | £1.10k | £691 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2014 | 21 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2013 | 06 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 MAY 1982 AS AMENDED 6 SEPTEMBER 1982, 9 OCTOBER 1984, 8 MAY 1985, 11 MAY 1988, 12 MAY 1993 AND 15 SEPTEMBER 1993. FURTHER AMENDED 10 MAY 1995, 14 MAY 1997 AND 19 MAY 1998
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, INFIRMITY AND OLD AGE AMONGST PERSONS LIVING IN BRIDLINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE TO HOSPITALS, OLD PEOPLE'S HOMES AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS.
Area of benefit
BRIDLINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window