ASIAN ASSOCIATION OF CHESTERFIELD & NORTH DERBYSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support domestic abuse victims, long-term carers; provide information, advice on welfare, health & social issues, assist translations; Represent members views to statutory authorities and advise on community issues; Develop improved links with the wider community; Combat discrimination through education & dialogue; through Saffron kitchen provides hot, freshly cooked meals to vulnerable members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,744 from 7 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 18 June 2019: CIO registration
- ASIAN ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Sonalee Joshi | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ipsita Roy | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr PARTHASARATHY POBBATHI | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
MAITREYI BOSE | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
SAROJ SINHA | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSHRI WELLS | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.43k | £80.39k | £83.50k | £73.86k | £136.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.04k | £69.54k | £78.76k | £106.34k | £107.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.19k | N/A | £11.12k | £41.69k | £3.74k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS LIVING IN CHESTERFIELD AND NORTH DERBYSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR MEMBERS OF THE ASIAN COMMUNITY BY: (A) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN PARTICULAR, IN THE ARTS OF MUSIC (IN PARTICULAR TRADITIONAL ASIAN MUSIC), DRAMA AND DANCE, ASIAN CULTURE BY HOLDING ANNUAL CULTURAL EVENTS SUCH AS HOLI AND DIWALI; (B) PROTECTING AND PRESERVING PUBLIC HEALTH BY DELIVERING REGULAR HEALTH WORKSHOPS ON RELEVANT HEALTH TOPICS; (C) RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED; AND (D) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 3 PENMORE BUSINESS CENTRE
SAXTON CLOSE
HASLAND ROAD
HASLAND
CHESTERFIELD
S41 0SJ
- Phone:
- 01246297452
- Email:
- asianassociation@OBTmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window