CHELTENHAM INTERNATIONAL FILM TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's purpose is to introduce, attract and boost audience attendance for the best of independent film via the Film Festival. The Festival reaches out both on line and face to face in order to reach as wide and diverse audience as possible whilst showcasing emerging filmmakers from across the globe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 21 May 2019: Standard registration
- CHELTENHAM INTERNATIONAL FILM FESTIVAL TRUST LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Kate Brewster | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Freda Holding | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Keith Sheldon | Trustee | 13 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL RATCLIFFE | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Laurence Marks | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.39k | £29.09k | £34.51k | £49.00k | £33.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.46k | £30.75k | £30.28k | £51.74k | £42.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.00k | £3.00k | N/A | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 June 2024 | 334 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 01 July 2024 | 337 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 March 2023 | 237 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 July 2024 | 702 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 05 January 2021 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 05 January 2021 | 159 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE APPRECIATION OF AND EDUCATION IN THE ARTS AND CRAFTS AND THEIR ASSOCIATED TECHNOLOGIES, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE OF THE CINEMA AND OTHER FORMS OF MOVING IMAGES, AND INCLUDING THOSE OF MUSIC, DRAMA, DANCING, MIME, GRAPHIC ARTS, PAINTING, SCULPTURE, LITERATURE, POETRY AND ORATORY ARTS. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC BY ENCOURAGING THE CREATIVE PARTICIPATION IN THE ARTS AND CRAFTS OF CINEMA, VIDEO AND OTHER FORMS OF MOVING IMAGES, INCLUDING DIRECTING, SCRIPT-WRITING, FILM EDITING, CINEMATOGRAPHY, SCORE-WRITING, SET AND MODEL MAKING, LIGHTING, FILM AND VIDEO PROJECTION, AND ALL OTHER FILM AND VIDEO-RELATED ARTS AND SKILLS. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, AESTHETICS AND THEORY OF MOVING IMAGES IN ALL THEIR ASPECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MIDWAY HOUSE
STAVERTON TECHNOLOGY PARK
HERRICK WAY
STAVERTON
CHELTENHAM
GLOS.
- Phone:
- 07772205515
- Email:
- Lmsheldon@cheltfilm.com
- Website:
-
cheltfilm.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window