RIDING FOR THE DISABLED - EXETER GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide free, supervised riding facilities for children in the Exeter, Devon, area. We hold riding sessions at Oaklands Riding School, Exeter on a Tuesday evening throughout the year. All our helpers are unpaid volunteers, including our qualified coaches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 06 November 2018: CIO registration
- 07 June 2019: Funds received from 1074357 RIDING FOR THE DISABLED - EXETER GROUP
- EXETER RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BOB GAIGER | Chair | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Yazhekov | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Edwards | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE RICHARDS | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Rowlands | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Steggles | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Shanahan | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kristen Birt | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Stubbins | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELLIE KERR | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Melksham | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.44k | £2.79k | £4.33k | £9.16k | £9.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.29k | £1.12k | £3.28k | £5.24k | £6.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("RDA") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE EXETER AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GULLIFORD HOUSE
MAMHEAD
EXETER
EX6 8HH
- Phone:
- 07528 319994
- Email:
- rda.exeter@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window