JALALABAD ISLAMIC CENTRE BRISTOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote faith of Islam by offering 5 time daily prayers and Friday prayers for the local Muslim community. The propagation of Islam according to Quran, the sunnah and hadith. Holding talks and activities for the local community including celebrating religious festivals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 27 March 2019: CIO registration
- JALALABAD ISLAMIC CENTRE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SYED IMRAN ALI | Chair | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
SABNA BEGUM | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED SALAM | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.50k | £18.95k | £15.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.25k | £14.56k | £13.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 June 2024 | 513 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 June 2024 | 513 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 June 2024 | 878 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 June 2024 | 878 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 July 2023 | 892 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 June 2024 | 1243 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A MOSQUE AND MADRASSAH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
JALALABAD ISLAMIC CENTRE
147-149 FISHPONDS ROAD
EASTVILLE
BRISTOL
BS5 6PR
- Phone:
- 01173820932
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window