Financial history SCHOOL LANE PRE-SCHOOL LLANDUDNO

Charity number: 1180616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £157.72k £173.41k £227.66k £274.18k £300.31k
Total expenditure £155.04k £159.86k £230.70k £255.25k £297.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £128.20k £124.97k
Income from government grants £102.80k £87.26k N/A £38.28k £11.85k