SCHOOL LANE PRE-SCHOOL LLANDUDNO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer full day care to children aged between 2 and 4 years old, we offer a drop off and pick up service to and from our local primary school, that is within walking distanc.We provide healthy snacks, teeth cleaning and a wide variety of educational and fun activities for the children, We have one manager and two supervisors and a highly dedicated team of qualified members of staff
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £124,972 from 6 government contract(s) and £11,851 from 4 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Conwy
Governance
- 08 November 2018: CIO registration
- 15 May 2020: Funds received from 1037418 SCHOOL LANE PLAYGROUP
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Strange | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Johanna elena Cornelia Valerio pop | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE EMERY | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.72k | £173.41k | £227.66k | £274.18k | £300.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.04k | £159.86k | £230.70k | £255.25k | £297.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £128.20k | £124.97k | |
|
Income from government grants | £102.80k | £87.26k | N/A | £38.28k | £11.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 08 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN WALES, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THEIR NEEDS THROUGH HIGH QUALITY CHILDCARE PROVISION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Schoollane pre-school
Old schoollane centre
Church Walks
LlANDUDNO
Conwy
LL30 2HL
- Phone:
- 01492577861
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window