THE TALENT TAP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Talent Tap is a social mobility charity with a mission to meaningfully change the lives of talented state educated students from lower socioeconomic backgrounds, by giving them the work experience, support, and network, that they need to succeed in their chosen careers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUPERT BARTON TAYLOR | Chair | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alix Alexandra Williams | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sunil Mashari | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROB WILLIS | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.18k | £94.28k | £440.59k | £416.45k | £342.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.98k | £35.38k | £335.17k | £440.78k | £411.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
158 North Road
Combe Down
BATH
BA2 5DL
- Phone:
- 07754364983
- Email:
- LAURA@THETALENTTAP.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window