EVERY LIFE MATTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our vision is of a community where people can talk openly about suicide, mental health problems and emotional distress. A community where people have the resources and skills to help those experiencing suicidal thoughts and mental health problems, and to support those impacted by, or bereaved by, suicide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,756 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 23 November 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs Katherine Jane Bainbridge | Chair | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Birdsall | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Helen Mathieson | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Esther Kirby | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jasper Chicago Kirkman | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Osbourne | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anita Margaret Kerrigan | Trustee | 10 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200.69k | £279.60k | £473.08k | £363.29k | £376.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.91k | £231.09k | £309.61k | £348.12k | £373.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £67.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £99.81k | £26.54k | £187.20k | N/A | £15.76k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL IN CUMBRIA AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS RELATING TO SUICIDE, SUICIDAL BEHAVIOUR AND SUICIDE BEREAVEMENT BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, AWARENESS RAISING AND PUBLIC EVENTS TO PROMOTE THE MENTAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF PEOPLE IN CUMBRIA AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE BEREAVED OR OTHERWISE IMPACTED BY SUICIDE BY THE PROVISION OF ADVOCACY, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BULLS HEAD
SHAP
PENRITH
CUMBRIA
CA10 3NG
- Phone:
- 07443479860
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window