Accounts and annual returns THE CAVERNOMA SOCIETY

Charity number: 1184406
Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
Annual return 31 January 2023 18 November 2024 354 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 18 November 2024 354 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 15 November 2024 716 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 15 November 2024 716 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 14 April 2023 500 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 April 2023 500 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 03 April 2023 854 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 03 April 2023 854 days late Download Open in new window