Financial history CRESCENT ARTS

Charity number: 513099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £89.94k £84.65k £101.16k £106.91k £94.37k
Total expenditure £87.85k £85.89k £97.61k £104.97k £92.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £8.00k
Income from government grants £78.52k N/A N/A £99.55k £85.95k