KEYS OF THE KINGDOM MINISTRIES - LIFE IN THE SPIRIT FELLOWSHIP INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROCLAIMING & SHARING THE GOSPEL AND PROVIDING RELIEF TO THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Barking And Dagenham
- Camden
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Pembrokeshire
- Surrey
- Waltham Forest
- Wandsworth
- West Sussex
- Mauritius
Governance
- 02 July 2021: CIO registration
- 26 April 2022: Funds received from 1085929 LIFE IN THE SPIRIT CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANALOU GALO | Chair | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Abustan | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
GILBERT DIAZ | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Theresa Echano | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS COLOSO | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Barfoot | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £471.78k | £399.60k | £433.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.28k | £295.75k | £332.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE VISION, STATEMENT OF FAITH AND PRACTICES APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR IN GREATER LONDON AND IN UNITED KINGDOM AND ANYWHERE ELSE IN THE WORLD BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE UK AND THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
268 Mitcham Road
London
SW17 9NT
- Phone:
- 02087674257
- Email:
- lsflondon@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
kkmlsfi.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window