Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN EAST PRESTON WITH KINGSTON
Charity Number: 1180544

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV ANDREW JOHN PERRY BTH | Chair | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tina Kathleen Poole | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Brunton | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jack Charles Cogman | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David John Moore | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|||||
MARY ROSE JEAVONS | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Philip Sherwin | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Alison Hammond | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Wray Allen | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Ann Russell | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Jane Hornby | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Julia Smith | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Winifred McLelland | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Henry Lewis | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Janice Ayling | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER RICHARD DERMOTT WOOD | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.