LIGHTHOUSE DERBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide high quality religious education for Muslim children and adults in Derby. We have used internal and external teachers for these courses. We use a local school's classrooms / lecture theatre to deliver these courses. During the covid pandemic we have restructured our courses for online delivery and continued to provide education and support to the children / familes we work with.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 25 July 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shahid Ahmed | Chair | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hamzah Hussain Ibrahim | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Siraj Adam Ali | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.65k | £10.52k | £3.83k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.01k | £8.25k | £9.03k | £353 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUNNI ISLAM IN THE DERBYSHIRE AREA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF SUNNI ISLAM, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, LECTURES AND RAISING AWARENESS TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
175 CLARENCE ROAD
DERBY
DE23 6LT
- Phone:
- 07896808937
- Email:
- info@lighthousederby.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window