Financial history HELPFUL HOUNDS ASSISTANCE DOGS

Charity number: 1181017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £37.33k £297.95k £91.12k £152.04k £375.82k
Total expenditure £34.01k £57.62k £145.38k £177.19k £253.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £40.00k £69.46k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A