COTSWOLD PLAYERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an amateur dramatic society with our own theatre. We welcome members to participate in all aspects of productions - on stage, back stage and front of house. We stage our own performances and in addition hire the theatre out for use by other groups, professional and amateur. A dance studio is also available for hire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
239 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 26 November 2018: CIO registration
- 03 March 2020: Funds received from 225223 COTSWOLD PLAYERS
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Claire Free | Chair | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham Anthony Gill | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Maskell | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Mauler | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jane Voyce | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Paul Clifford | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Lesley Mauler | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Terry Dawn Clifford | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Round Kendall | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Ann Kilmister | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.78k | £44.06k | £364.64k | £86.47k | £103.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.95k | £60.84k | £91.64k | £98.33k | £81.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £20.14k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 26 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF DRAMA AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION IN THE SAID ARTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE COTSWOLD PLAYERS
PARLIAMENT STREET
STROUD
GL5 1LW
- Phone:
- 01453488040
- Email:
- tm@cotswoldplayhouse.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window