SOUTH TYNESIDE ANIMAL RESCUE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Animal welfare operating cat refuge centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 11 October 1984: Standard registration
- 17 April 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- STAR ANIMAL RESCUE (Working name)
- STAR CAT REFUGE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | 30/04/2016 | 30/04/2017 | 30/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.18k | £3.80k | £3.11k | £3.15k | £3.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.36k | £29.60k | £24.11k | £25.82k | £23.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | 29 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | 11 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2016 | 13 July 2017 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2015 | 25 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 JULY 1982 AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTARY TRUST DEED DATED 23 JULY 1982.
Charitable objects
A. THE RESCUE AND REHABILITATION OF INJURED STRAY AND DISTRESSED ANIMALS; B. THE ENCOURAGEMENT IN APPROPRIATE CASES OF SPAYING AND NEUTERING TO AVOID UNWANTED BREEDING; C. THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CARE OF ANIMALS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE TRUST DEED)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE SUNDERLAND.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window