THE HARMONY INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Harmony Initiative is dedicated to the promotion of religious harmony by: *Educating the public in different religious beliefs including an awareness of their distinctive features and their common ground to promote good relations between persons of different faiths *Promoting knowledge and mutual understanding and respect of the beliefs and practices of different religious faiths.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUKHSANA RAFIQ | Chair | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abbas Hussain | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED HAROON AYUB | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES FREDERICK DARLEY QPM | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY:- 1. EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS; 2. PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Business Centre
2A Seaton Street
Middlesbrough
TS1 3NQ
- Phone:
- 00
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window