FAT BEEHIVE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the efficiency and effectiveness of charities and voluntary organisations in the voluntary sector in England and Wales for the public benefit in particular, but not exclusively, by providing grants relating to their use of information technology.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 October 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Temidire Odesanya | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Awaritefe | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tom Moreton | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
LEONIE MAY JARRETT | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVID ADRIAN LUKES | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Taylor | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £10.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £7.23k | £7.52k | £10.00k | £10.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2024 | 295 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 OCT 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS IN THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING GRANTS RELATING TO THEIR USE OF INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10a Lant Street
London
SE1 1QR
- Phone:
- 01234 988787
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window