TRINIDAD AND TOBAGO HEALTHCARE UK FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We believe that healthcare standards must be improved, so that people receive care that is safe and effective. We are committed to working in partnership with healthcare providers and being advocates to people who use healthcare services. We believe that high standards of care should be provided to all sections of society and that poor care, negligence and malpractice must be discouraged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Trinidad And Tobago
Governance
- 03 June 2019: CIO registration
- TTHUF (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER JAMES | Chair | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Vashti Ragoonanan | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
NATASHA QUEVA-KENT | Trustee | 21 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
TRICIA ZENISA GEORGE | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
KIRT HUNTE | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.53k | £4.02k | £4.35k | £1.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.93k | £2.18k | £1.92k | £634 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH IN TRINIDAD AND TOBAGO, THE COMMONWEALTH AND NON-COMMONWEALTH COUNTRIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) UTILISING THE SKILLS, KNOWLEDGE AND EXPERIENCE OF MEMBERS AND OTHER HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS TO FACILITATE SAFER AND MORE EFFECTIVE HEALTHCARE IN TRINIDAD AND TOBAGO, THE COMMONWEALTH AND NON-COMMONWEALTH COUNTRIES. (2) COLLABORATING WITH THE MINISTRY OF HEALTH, HEALTHCARE AND PROFESSIONAL ORGANISATIONS, TRAINING INSTITUTIONS AND REGISTRATION BODIES IN TRINIDAD AND TOBAGO, THE COMMONWEALTH AND NON-COMMONWEALTH COUNTRIES; (3) COLLABORATING WITH AND SUPPORTING NON-GOVERNMENTAL ORGANISATIONS (NGOS) THAT REPRESENT PATIENTS IN TRINIDAD AND TOBAGO, THE COMMONWEALTH AND NON-COMMONWEALTH COUNTRIES; (4) SHARING BEST PRACTICE BETWEEN THE UNITED KINGDOM, TRINIDAD AND TOBAGO, THE COMMONWEALTH AND NON-COMMONWEALTH COUNTRIES;
Contact information
- Address:
-
74
HAYNT WALK
LONDON
74 Haynt Walk
LONDON
SW20 9NX
- Phone:
- 07904955497
- Email:
- tthuf@gmx.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window