Accounts and annual returns EAGLE HEART

Charity number: 1180710
Charity reporting is overdue by 1712 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 251 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 251 days
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 617 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 617 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 982 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 982 days
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1347 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1347 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1712 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1712 days