PINK SISTERS STAFFS BREAST CANCER SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pink Sisters was created to support people who have been diagnosed with all types of cancers and their families and friends that have been affected by their cancer diagnosis. We aim to provide a safe space for people living with cancer to come together, share and express their feelings, ask questions and meet others in a similar situation or who have followed similar treatment plans.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 05 April 2019: CIO registration
- PINK SISTERS (Working name)
- Pink Sisters and Misters (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derrith Turner | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|||||
JANET STANWAY | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE MACKENZIE | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEVE ABENE | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.05k | £28.29k | £59.41k | £41.48k | £82.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.79k | £30.80k | £25.15k | £35.88k | £66.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 May 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 May 2024 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 May 2023 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 31 October 2022 | 184 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 May 2021 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS LIVING WITH CANCER AND THEIR FAMILY AND CARERS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND A BREAST CANCER SUPPORT GROUP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 LANGDALE CRESCENT
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST1 6DR
- Phone:
- 07786007315
- Email:
- pinksistersstaffs@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window