CANVEY THAMESIDE U3A

Charity Number: 1181172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of education and in particular the education of older people and those who are retired from full time employment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £28,738
Total expenditure: £24,321

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 December 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mrs Diane Smith Chair 01 August 2014
None on record
Frances Mary Barbour Trustee 01 October 2020
PARENTS' AID (SOUTHERN ESSEX)
Received: On time
Ms Jackie Ryan Trustee 01 August 2018
None on record
Mrs Jeanette Parminter Trustee 01 August 2017
None on record
Mrs Linda Bose Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record
Mrs Janice Dowdall Trustee 01 August 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £15.86k £2.94k £3.94k £23.31k £28.74k
Total expenditure £14.03k £3.21k £3.60k £21.29k £24.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 14 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 11 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 07 August 2024 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 12 July 2023 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 13 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
155 Long Road
CANVEY ISLAND
Essex
SS8 0JD
Phone:
07879850243