THE SOCIETY FOR LINCOLNSHIRE HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Society are for the benefit of the public to:- advance the heritage of the historic county of Lincolnshire; advance education by recording local history, archaeology, industrial archaeology, topography, architecture, population studies, dialect and other similar objects of local interest; and preserve the building known as Jews' Court, Lincoln and the ruins of Bardney Abbey
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 21 March 2019: CIO registration
- 25 November 2020: Funds received from 1144582 JEWS' COURT AND BARDNEY ABBEY TRUST
- SLHA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven George Stefaniuk | Chair | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew G Walker | Trustee | 23 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stewart Alan George Bennett | Trustee | 23 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JOHN BETTERIDGE MICE | Trustee | 06 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Michael Owen Daly | Trustee | 06 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Kenneth George | Trustee | 25 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosalyn Diane Mellows | Trustee | 12 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
NEIL RICHARD WRIGHT | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Charles Nicholas Moore | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.89k | £46.90k | £33.51k | £66.92k | £61.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.13k | £44.51k | £43.69k | £58.70k | £65.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 April 2022 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 April 2021 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 April 2021 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 4.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE HERITAGE AND HISTORY OF THE HISTORIC COUNTY OF LINCOLNSHIRE BY RECORDING LOCAL HISTORY, ARCHAEOLOGY, INDUSTRIAL ARCHAEOLOGY, TOPOGRAPHY, ARCHITECTURE, POPULATION STUDIES, DIALECT, MANNERS, CUSTOMS AND OTHER SIMILAR OBJECTS OF LOCAL INTEREST; AND 4.2 TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE BUILDING KNOWN AS JEWS' COURT, LINCOLN AND THE RUINS OF BARDNEY ABBEY, LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jews' Court
Steep Hill
LINCOLN
LN2 1LS
- Phone:
- 01522521337
- Email:
- info@slha.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window