MEDWAY SHELTER AND SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Medway Night Shelter is run by Medway Churches and other concerned local groups to help homeless people with a connection to Medway. Originally set up to provide support during the coldest and most difficult time of the year, activities have expanded to include a year round project for homeless and vulnerably housed people, namely a drop in centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Medway
Governance
- 04 December 2018: CIO registration
- MEDWAY WINTER NIGHT SHELTER (Working name)
- MEDWAY NIGHT SHELTER (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Elizabeth Anne Cox | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
ANDREW MILLEST | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
NATASHA BECKHELLING | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Lieutenant MARTYN BELLSHAW | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
MARTIN CHARLES EARLE | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.95k | £46.76k | £51.06k | £13.23k | £14.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.46k | £17.71k | £28.21k | £53.54k | £22.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.15k | £48.62k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Dec 2018 as amended on 22 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF EMERGENCY AND OTHER ACCOMMODATION, ADVICE, SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE FOR PERSONS IN NEED, WHO ARE DEEMED TO BE HOMELESS, VULNERABLY HOUSED OR OTHERWISE SUFFERING THE EFFECTS OF POVERTY, THROUGH COLLABORATION BETWEEN CHURCHES AND OTHER CONCERNED INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O The Salvation Army
50 Green Street
GILLINGHAM
Kent
ME7 1XA
- Phone:
- 01634231690
- Email:
- medwayshelter@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window